ND SB2303 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 36-01-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the composition of the state board of animal health.
Title
The composition of the state board of animal health.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Sen. Curtis Olafson [R] |
Rep. Kenton Onstad [D] | Sen. Ryan Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 86 | |
2011-03-29 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 | |
2011-03-24 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2011-03-04 | Request return from committee | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-11 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1 | |
2011-02-04 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |