ND SB2230 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to establishing an adoption assistance program for costs associated with the home study process; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
Establishing an adoption assistance program for costs associated with the home study process; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 4 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 88 |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 11:23 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-02-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 6 0 0 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:20 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |