ND SB2003 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota university system; to provide contingent appropriations; to create and enact six new sections to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to provisions of matching grants for the advancement of postsecondary academics; to amend and reenact sections 15-10-47, 15-52-01, 15-52-03, 15-52-04, 15-52-05, 15-52-09, 15-52-31, and 15-62.2-02, subsection
Title
A contingent appropriation; to provide an exemption; to provide for transfer of funds; to authorize the state board of higher education to issue and sell bonds for capital projects; to provide for budget section reports; to provide loan authorization for the university of North Dakota school of medicine and health sciences facility project; to provide for legislative management reports; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/20 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-03 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 17 |
2013-05-03 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Emergency clause failed |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 11 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference committee appointed Skarphol Martinson Williams |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Holmberg Krebsbach Robinson |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-17 | House | Emergency clause failed |
2013-04-17 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 60 nays 33 |
2013-04-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 6 1 |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 04:15 |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 36 nays 11, Emergency clause carried |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Division B adopted |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Division A lost |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Division of amendment |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 1 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:45 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:45 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |