ND SB2002 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the judicial branch; and to amend and reenact section 27-02-02, subsection
Title
Salaries of supreme and district court judges and disposition of vacant judgeships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 4 |
2013-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed Sanford Brandenburg Guggisberg |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Kilzer Carlisle Warner |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 10 |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 5 2 |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |