ND HCR3004 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the Uniform Certificate of Title for Vessels Act.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the Uniform Certificate of Title for Vessels Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-01 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2013-01-29 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba3004.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-3036-01000.pdf |