ND HB1479 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 62.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to restrictions on the possession, use, and manufacture of knives; and to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 62.1-01-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of dangerous weapon.
Title
The definition of dangerous weapon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 65 |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:10 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 08:15 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |