ND HB1386 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-18.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to local boards of school districts' discretion to designate educational professional development content areas; and to amend and reenact section 15.1-07-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to youth behavioral health professional development.
Title
Youth behavioral health professional development.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelby Timmons [R] | Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] | Rep. Jim Jonas [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Rep. Eric Murphy [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. David Richter [R] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R] |
Sen. Cole Conley [R] | Sen. Randy Lemm [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16 |
2023-03-17 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-10 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2023-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:22 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |