ND HB1305 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 4-37-01, 4-37-02, 4-37-03, and 4-37-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to agriculture in the classroom.
Title
Agriculture in the classroom.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/14 | |
2011-03-15 | Signed by Governor 03/14 | |
2011-03-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-11 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-10 | Returned to House | |
2011-03-08 | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 | |
2011-03-07 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-03-04 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee | |
2011-02-11 | Received from House | |
2011-02-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 | |
2011-02-07 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-04 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3 | |
2011-02-03 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |