ND HB1249 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Hogue, Miller A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 5-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a domestic distillery license; and to amend and reenact sections 5-03-06 and 5-03-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to examination by and reports to the tax commissioner and the imposition of tax on alcoholic beverages sold in this state.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Hogue, Miller A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 5-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a domestic distillery license; and to amend and reenact sections 5-03-06 and 5-03-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to examination by and reports to the tax commissioner and the imposition of tax on alcoholic beverages sold in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-15 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-04-13 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-11 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-10 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 043 nays 003 | |
2009-03-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-11 | Received from House | |
2009-02-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1249.html |