ND HB1135 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the state department of health for a mobile dental care services grant.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the state department of health for a mobile dental care services grant.
Sponsors
Rep. George Keiser [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2013-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 2 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2013-02-20 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 22 0 0 |
2013-01-24 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-01-24 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |