ND HB1133 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-01, a new subsection to section 57-01-02.1, a new subsection to section 57-38-30.5, and a new subsection to section 57-40.3-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to minimum tax payments and refunds, offsets of overpaid local option taxes from future distributions, the effect of the expiration of the federal research tax credit on the state income tax credit for research and experimental expenditures, and exemptions from motor vehicle excise tax; to amend and reenact sections 5-03-05, 40-57.1-04.4, and 40-57.3-04, subsection 4 of section 57-02-27.2, subsection
Title
Authority of the tax commissioner to adopt rules, the tax lien of record clearance requirement for the new and expanding business income tax exemption, offsets of restaurant, restaurant and lodging, and city motor vehicle rental taxes from future distributions, removal of obsolete language from provisions relating to the valuation and assessment of agricultural lands, estimated income tax requirements for corporations, articles taxed in other states or political subdivisions of other states, and establishing energy per volume equivalent of liquefied natural gas for special fuels tax purposes; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor 04/09 |
2015-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0 |
2015-04-06 | House | Concurred |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2015-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2015-02-13 | House | Request return from committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2015-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2015-01-28 | House | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2015-01-28 | House | Amendment failed, placed on calendar |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2015-01-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2015-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |