ND HB1128 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 14-03.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Uniform Premarital and Marital Agreements Act and the abrogation of common law regarding premarital and marital agreements; to repeal chapter 14-03.1 and section 30.1-05-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Uniform Premarital Agreement Act and the waiver of right to elect of a surviving spouse; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
The Uniform Premarital Agreement Act and the waiver of right to elect of a surviving spouse; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/02 |
2013-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 30 nays 15 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 2 |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Grabinger to replace Sen. Nelson on conference committee |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hogue Armstrong Nelson |
2013-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed K. Koppelman Brabandt Toman |
2013-04-16 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 9 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2013-01-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:20 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |