ND HB1029 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Energy Development and Transmission Committee) AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-35.3-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a tax credit for contributions to the housing incentive fund; to amend and reenact subsection
Title
A multifamily housing finance program and to the housing incentive fund and tax credits; to provide a report to the budget section; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor 05/03 |
2013-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 5, Emergency clause carried |
2013-05-01 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-25 | House | Appoint Rep. Dockter to replace Rep. Headland on conference committee |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Cook Campbell Dotzenrod |
2013-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed Owens Headland Haak |
2013-04-17 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-12 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 5, Emergency clause carried |
2013-01-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2013-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |