ND HB1012 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT providing an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of human services; to provide for intermediate care facility construction review; to amend and reenact subdivision
Title
Criminal background checks for foster care providers, child support payments, and definitions for expanded service payments for elderly and disabled; to provide an exemption; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide for legislative management studies; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/02 |
2013-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 15 |
2013-05-01 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Kilzer Erbele Mathern |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference committee appointed Pollert Bellew Holman |
2013-04-18 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 8 |
2013-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 5 1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |