NC S99 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Ch. SL 2021-154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Ch. SL 2021-154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify Law on Theft of Catalytic Converters
Title
Clarify Law on Theft of Catalytic Converters
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McInnis [R] | Sen. Jim Burgin [R] | Sen. David Craven [R] | Sen. Lisa Barnes [R] |
Rep. Sarah Crawford [D] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Vickie Sawyer [R] | Sen. James Woodard [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Ch. SL 2021-154 | |
2021-09-16 | Signed by Gov. 9/16/2021 | |
2021-09-07 | Pres. To Gov. 9/7/2021 | |
2021-09-03 | Ratified | |
2021-09-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-09-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-09-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-09-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-09-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-03 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Data & Records Systems
Fines & Penalties
Information Technology
Motor Vehicles
Presented
Public
Ratified
Records
Recycling
Scrap Yards & Dealers
Sentencing
Theft
Transportation
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Data & Records Systems
Fines & Penalties
Information Technology
Motor Vehicles
Presented
Public
Ratified
Records
Recycling
Scrap Yards & Dealers
Sentencing
Theft
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
14 | 72.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
66 | 421 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 424 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 429 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 430 | (n/a) | Citation Text |