NC S99 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Ch. SL 2018-5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Ch. SL 2018-5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations Act of 2018
Title
Appropriations Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - Veto Override (Y: 73 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-01 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 72 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M8 Re-Refer Conf. Com. w/ Instructions C RPT Adoption (Y: 44 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-31 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l Motion 12 Objection to Consideration C RPT Adoption (Y: 44 N: 70 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt For Adoption Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt For Adoption Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-01 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 72 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M8 Re-Refer Conf. Com. w/ Instructions C RPT Adoption (Y: 44 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-31 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l Motion 12 Objection to Consideration C RPT Adoption (Y: 44 N: 70 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt For Adoption Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt For Adoption Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Ch. SL 2018-5 | |
2018-06-12 | House | Veto Overridden |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44.2 (b) |
2018-06-07 | House | Veto Received From Senate |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Veto Overridden |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-06 | Vetoed 06/06/2018 | |
2018-06-01 | Pres. To Gov. 6/1/2018 | |
2018-06-01 | Ratified | |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-01 | House | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2018-05-31 | House | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Conf Report Passed 2nd |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/31/2018 |
2018-05-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2018-05-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-05-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2018-05-29 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com on Pensions and Retirement and Aging |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Com |
2018-05-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2018-05-29 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com on Finance |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Com |
2018-05-28 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Held As Material |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2018-05-28 | House | Ruled Material |
2018-05-28 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conferees Reappointed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conf Com Dismissed |
2018-05-23 | House | Conferees Changed |
2018-05-22 | House | Conferees Reappointed |
2018-05-22 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2017-06-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017 |
2017-06-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2017-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |