NC S712 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Ch. SL 2013-233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Ch. SL 2013-233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ID Card for Homebound Persons
Title
ID Card for Homebound Persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Ch. SL 2013-233 | |
2013-07-03 | Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013 | |
2013-06-25 | Pres. To Gov. 06/25/2013 | |
2013-06-24 | Ratified | |
2013-06-20 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2013 |
2013-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-17 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2013-04-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-16 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed |