NC S411 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Failed Concur In H Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Failed Concur In H Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Various Education Changes
Title
Various Education Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-28 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2023 |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2023-06-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-06-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-06-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-06-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-06-13 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-25 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-24 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Education
Education Boards
Educational Testing
Home Schooling
Local Government
Public
Secondary Education
Testing
Education
Education Boards
Educational Testing
Home Schooling
Local Government
Public
Secondary Education
Testing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 111.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 174.18 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 174.26 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 218.75 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 238.66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 315 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 375.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 47 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 565.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 239.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text |