NC S295 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-531
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-531
Summary
Clarify Closest Market.
Title
Clarify Closest Market.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-531 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Ratified | |
2009-08-03 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-03 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-07-22 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-22 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-08 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2009-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2009 | |
2009-07-07 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2009 | |
2009-07-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-27 | Re-ref Com On Transportation | |
2009-05-27 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Transportation | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-25 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-02-24 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S295 |