NC S220 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-570
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-570
Summary
General Statutes Comm. Technical Corrections.
Title
General Statutes Comm. Technical Corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-570 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-07 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2009-08-06 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-19 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-02-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H191 (Same As) 2011-03-01 - Adopted
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S220 |