NC S148 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Ch. SL 2013-36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Ch. SL 2013-36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempt Certain Steel Tubing/Electrical K'ors
Title
Exempt Certain Steel Tubing/Electrical K'ors
Sponsors
Sen. Neal Hunt [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Ch. SL 2013-36 | |
2013-04-24 | Signed by Gov. 4/24/2013 | |
2013-04-18 | Pres. To Gov. 04/18/2013 | |
2013-04-17 | Ratified | |
2013-04-16 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-04-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Postponed To 04/16/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-25 | House | Ref To Com On Public Utilities and Energy |
2013-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |