NC S133 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-10 - Ch. SL 2009-576
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-10 - Ch. SL 2009-576
Summary
Registers of Deeds' Pension.
Title
Registers of Deeds' Pension.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-10 | Ch. SL 2009-576 | |
2009-09-10 | Signed By Gov. 9/10/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-04 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-06-03 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-06-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref To Com On Pensions, Retirement & Aging | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S133 |