NC H988 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-14 - Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-14 - Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
2024 Retirement Technical Corrections
Title
2024 Retirement Technical Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-14 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2024 | |
2024-06-13 | Ratified | |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2024-05-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2024-05-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-05-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-05-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-05-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2024-05-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-05-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2024-05-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-05-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Cjrs
General Assembly
Judges
Lgers
Lgers Board
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Lrs
Magistrates
Public
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
Teachers
Tsers
Tsers Board
Cjrs
General Assembly
Judges
Lgers
Lgers Board
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Lrs
Magistrates
Public
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
Teachers
Tsers
Tsers Board
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
120 | 4.31 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
128 | 23 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 26 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 27 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 28 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 29 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 32.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
135 | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 10.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 107 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 48.10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 74 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 86-2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 86-6 | (n/a) | Citation Text |