MT SB56 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate calculation errors of taxes, fees, and assessments to local government
Title
Eliminate calculation errors of taxes, fees, and assessments to local government
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Jent [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred (Y: 16 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-02 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2013-03-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2013-03-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2013-02-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2013-01-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Taxation |
2013-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-07 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2012-12-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-12 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2012-11-20 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-11-19 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-11-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-11-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-11-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2012-11-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-11-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-12 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-10-11 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-07-23 | (C) Draft Request Received |