MT SB269 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that present law adjustments are not included in base budget
Title
Clarifying that present law adjustments are not included in base budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2013-05-06 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-12 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2013-04-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-03 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2013-03-09 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-02-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-02-08 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-07 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-07 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-02-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-05 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |