MT SB171 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise taxation of income, including the corporate income tax
Title
Generally revise taxation of income, including the corporate income tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-27 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2015-03-10 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2015-02-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2015-01-29 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-19 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2015-01-19 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-19 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-16 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-13 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-01-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-10 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2015-01-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-03 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-11-26 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-09-12 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2013-06-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |