MT SB127 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require Montana to provide funding for enforcement of PL280
Title
Require Montana to provide funding for enforcement of PL280
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hertz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-14 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2023-03-03 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-25 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-22 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-02-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-01-26 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-01-05 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-01-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-01-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-05 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-01-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2022-12-28 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2022-12-21 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2022-12-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2022-11-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2022-11-21 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2022-11-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2022-11-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2022-11-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-11-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2022-11-04 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2022-11-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-10-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-09-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |