MT HB535 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise state land cabin site laws
Title
Generally revise state land cabin site laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature |
2013-05-10 | House | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress |
2013-05-06 | House | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared |
2013-05-06 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Natural Resources |
2013-04-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Natural Resources |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2013-03-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2013-03-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-03-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2013-02-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-18 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-02-18 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-02-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-05 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2013-01-26 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-11-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |