MT HB400 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow electronic ballot for disabled voters
Title
Allow electronic ballot for disabled voters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-01 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-03-18 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-03-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2015-02-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-31 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-30 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |