MS SC600 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Mississippi Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks' Award-winning Museum Of Natural Science On The Occasion Of Its Two-million Visitor Landmark Celebration At Naturefest! 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognize MDWFP Museum of Natural Science on its two-Million Visitor Landmark Celebration at NatureFEST! 2014.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-18 - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-18HouseReturned For Enrolling
2014-03-18HouseImmediate Release
2014-03-18HouseAdopted
2014-03-17HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2014-03-14HouseReferred To Rules
2014-03-13SenateTransmitted To House
2014-03-13SenateImmediate Release
2014-03-13SenateAdopted
2014-03-11SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2014-03-11SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback