MS SC579 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Accomplishments And Civic Leadership Of Dr. Lee Gardner Royce As The 19th President Of Mississippi College.
Title
Recognize the accomplishments and civic leadership of Dr. Lee Gardner Royce, 19th President of Mississippi College.
Sponsors
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] | Sen. Bill Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-02-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-02-28 | House | Adopted |
2014-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |