MS SC546 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute To The Memory And Commending The Life Of Dr. B. Rowe Byers, Longtime Professor Of Microbiology At The University Of Mississippi School Of Medicine.
Title
Commend the life of Dr. B. Rowe Byers, Professor of Microbiology at UMMC.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Brown [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] |
Sen. Haskins Montgomery [D] | Sen. Bill Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-02-05 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-02-05 | House | Adopted |
2014-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |