MS SB2972 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-65-22, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From The Amusement Tax Guided Tours On Navigable Waters Of This State, Which Include Providing Accommodations, Guide Services And/or Related Equipment Operated By Or Under The Direction Of The Person Providing The Tour, For The Purposes Of Outdoor Tourism And Admissions To Events Held Solely For Religious Or Charitable Purposes At Livestock Facilities, Agriculture Facilities Or Other Facilities Constructed, Renovated Or Expanded With Funds For The Grant Program Authorized Under Section 18, Chapter 530, Laws Of 1995; To Amend Section 27-65-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 1555, 2014 Regular Session, To Exempt From Sales Taxation Gross Collections Derived From Guided Tours On Navigable Waters Of This State, Which Include Providing Accommodations, Guide Services And/or Related Equipment Operated By Or Under The Direction Of The Person Providing The Tour, For The Purposes Of Outdoor Tourism; To Amend Section 27-65-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From Sales Taxation Parking At Events Held Solely For Religious Or Charitable Purposes At Livestock Facilities, Agriculture Facilities Or Other Facilities Constructed, Renovated Or Expanded With Funds For The Grant Program Authorized Under Section 18, Chapter 530, Laws Of 1995; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; exempt certain guided tour activities and certain livestock admissions and parking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-31 - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23 Approved by Governor
2014-04-07HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-04-03SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-31SenateConference Report Adopted
2014-03-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2014-03-29HouseConference Report Filed
2014-03-29SenateConference Report Filed
2014-03-26HouseConferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Lamar
2014-03-24SenateConferees Named Fillingane,Doty,Jackson (11th)
2014-03-20SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2014-03-19HouseReturned For Concurrence
2014-03-18HousePassed As Amended
2014-03-18HouseAmended
2014-03-18HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2014-03-06HouseReferred To Ways and Means
2014-02-27SenateTransmitted To House
2014-02-26SenatePassed
2014-02-25SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-02-24SenateReferred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback