MS SB2870 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The Office Of State Aid Road Construction Of The Mississippi Department Of Transportation For Fiscal Year 2016.
Title
Appropriation; Transportation, Department of - State Aid Road Construction, Office of.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Thomas Gollott [R] |
Sen. Russell Jolly [D] | Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-30 | House | Reconsidered |
2015-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Frierson, Huddleston (15th)) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-29 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Johnson,Barker |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Simmons (13th),Wiggins |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-16 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-16 | House | Amended |
2015-03-13 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |