MS SB2726 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 7-7-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Auditor To Audit Program Funds From The Federal Restore Act, Gulf Environmental Benefit Fund, And Fees Derived From The Natural Resources Damages Assessment Pursuant To The 2010 Deepwater Horizon Explosion And Oil Spill; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Auditor; authorize to conduct audits of certain Gulf Coast restoration programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Deborah Dawkins [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Turner,Holloway,Sullivan |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Collins,Blount,Polk |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To AC |
2014-02-25 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AC To AP |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To S.C. Accountblty,Efficiency,Transparency;Appropriations |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |