MS SB2556 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-21-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Education To Provide Certain Data Metrics Relating To Achievement And Non-achievement Effects Of The Early Learning Collaborative Act Of 2013 To Better Measure Program Outcomes In Future Evaluations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Early Learning Collaborative Act; require the Department of Education to provide certain data on educational effects.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Younger [R] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] |
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred To Education |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Education |