MS SB2486 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration, Acting On Behalf Of The Mississippi Department Of Archives And History, To Donate To The U.s. Department Of The Interior, National Park Service, Vicksburg National Military Park Certain Real Property Under The Possession And Control Of The Department Of Archives And History, Located In Hinds And Claiborne Counties, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Dept. of Archives and History property; DFA may transfer certain lands to U.S. Dept. of the Interior, Vicksburg National Military Park.
Sponsors
Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Steve Hale [D] |
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Phillip Gandy [R] | Sen. Sally Doty [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-06 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed |
2014-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Public Property |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Passed |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |