MS SB2325 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 57-1-781 And 57-1-783, Mississippi Code Of 1972, The Forestry Facility Grant Program, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Forestry Facility Grant Program; bring forward.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Forestry;Appropriations B |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Forestry |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 1 | 781 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 783 | New Code | See Bill Text |