MS SB2269 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 55-24-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Membership And Terms Of The Mississippi Coast Coliseum Commission; To Amend Section 55-24-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Amend Sections 55-24-9 And 55-24-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Powers And Duties Of The Mississippi Coast Coliseum Commission And Require That Certain Actions Be Approved By The Harrison County Board Of Supervisors; To Transfer Administration And Management Of The Coliseum Trust Fund To The Harrison County Board Of Supervisors To Be Used Exclusively For Capital Improvements To The Coliseum; To Amend Section 27-104-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude The Coliseum Trust Fund From Those Funds That Require A State Appropriation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Coast Coliseum Commission; authorize expenditure of money in its trust fund for certain purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Vetoed | |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,DeLano,Bennett |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Burton,Gollott |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-04 | House | Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |