MS SB2245 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-15-6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Education To Report Aggregate Data That Does Not Disclose Any Personally Identifiable Information Of Students; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Education data; authorize the Department of Education to report aggregate data in compliance with federal standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Died On Calendar |
2024-03-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred To Education |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Education |