MS SB2146 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Failed on March 12 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 49-7-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Grant The Commission On Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks Plenary Authority To Set The Bag Limits For White-tailed Deer And Promulgate Any Regulations Necessary Therefor, Consistent With Best Management Practices, Scientific Data And Subject To Applicable Existing Law, Rules And Regulations Of This State Or The United States Of America; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deer bag limit; grant the Commission on Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks plenary power to set.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-06 - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-12HouseDied On Calendar
2014-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-02-14HouseReferred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
2014-02-07SenateTransmitted To House
2014-02-06SenatePassed
2014-01-30SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-01-10SenateReferred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback