MS SB2121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Criminalize The Disclosure Without Consent Of Intimate Visual Material; To Define Terms; To Provide Penalties For The Crime; To Enumerate Certain Defenses; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Intimate visual material; criminalize disclosure of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Owen,Ford (73rd) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,England,Thomas |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-10 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Amendment Failed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |