MS SB2090 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 37-151-103 And 37-9-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 71, 2014 Regular Session, To Authorize School Districts To Process A Semimonthly Or A Monthly Payroll For Nonlicensed Employees, In The Discretion Of The Local School Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Payroll date for school district employees; authorize semimonthly payroll in discretion of local school board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-12 | House | Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2014-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-04 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To ED |
2014-02-26 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-04 | Senate | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |