MS HC54 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Blues Artist Extraordinaire Dexter Allen Of Crystal Springs, Mississippi, Upon His Achievements And Success In The Music Industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dexter Allen; commend musical artistry and success as Blues Musician.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-06SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-04SenateReturned For Enrolling
2014-03-04SenateImmediate Release
2014-03-04SenateAdopted
2014-03-03SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2014-02-28SenateReferred To Rules
2014-02-28HouseTransmitted To Senate
2014-02-28HouseImmediate Release
2014-02-28HouseAdopted
2014-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2014-02-27HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback