MS HC42 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Cotillion Federated Club Upon The Special Occasion And Celebration Of Its 55th Anniversary.
Title
Cotillion Federated Club; commend and congratulate on the occasion of its 55th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-01-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-01-28 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-01-28 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-28 | Adopted | |
2010-01-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-21 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-01-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-01-20 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-20 | Adopted | |
2010-01-19 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Rules |