MS HB932 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 71-5-5, 71-5-7, 71-5-11, 71-5-19, 71-5-351, 71-5-353, 71-5-355, 71-5-367, 71-5-389, 71-5-453, 71-5-455, 71-5-505 And 71-5-511, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Place Administrative Control Over The Unemployment Trust Fund And The Unemployment Compensation Fund Exclusively In The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security (mdes); To Revise Certain Terms In The Mississippi Employment Security Law; To Give The Mdes The Authority To Administratively Issue Garnishments To Collect Delinquent Employer Taxes And Recover Unemployment Benefit Overpayments; To Authorize The Executive Director Of The Mdes To Grant Extensions Of Time To File Certain Reports Under Certain Circumstances; To Provide Additional Funds For The Mississippi Workforce Enhancement Training Fund For One Calendar Year; To Provide That An Employer Shall Be Charged Against His Experience Rating If The Employer Fails To Respond Adequately Or Timely To A Request Of The Mdes For Information Relating To An Unemployment Claim That Was Subsequently Determined Improperly Paid And The Employer Has Failed To Respond Timely Or Adequately To Such Requests; To Expand The Definition Of The Term "debtor" And "refund" Under The Provisions That Allow Mdes To Collect Debts Through Setoffs Against A Taxpayer's Income Tax Refund; To Revise The Manner In Which Notice Is Given To A Taxpayer Of A Hearing To Protest A Setoff Against The Taxpayer's State Income Tax Refund For Debts The Taxpayer Owes Mdes; To Provide That The One Week Waiting Period For Unemployment Benefits May Be Waived Only Upon A Presidential Disaster Declaration Authorizing Assistance To Individuals And Only In Areas Identified In The Disaster Declaration For Individual Assistance; To Require That An Unemployed Individual Must Be Actively Seeking Work To Be Eligible To Receive Benefits; To Amend Sections 71-5-13, 71-5-357, 71-5-361 And 71-5-501, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Department of Employment Security; expand authority of.
Sponsors
Rep. Donnie Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-02-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-02-28 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2013-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations |