MS HB765 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "alternative Fuel Vehicles For Mississippi Act Of 2013"; To Create New Section 27-7-22.37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Income Tax Credit For Any Taxpayer Purchasing, Constructing Or Installing An Alternative Fuel Conversion Kit On A Motor Vehicle, A Motor Vehicle With An Alternative Fuel Motor Fuel System As Original Equipment, A Refueling System Installed At A Private Home Or Residence Or At A Business For Nonpublic Refueling With Alternative Fuel Of Personal Or Business Alternative Fuel Motor Vehicles, Or A Refueling Station Operated For Refueling Of Alternative Fuel Motor Vehicles Owned By The Taxpayer, Private Customers Of The Taxpayer Or The General Public; To Amend Section 27-65-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude From Sales Taxation The Sale Of Natural Gas For Use As Taxable Motor Fuel; To Amend Sections 27-59-3, 27-59-7, 27-59-9, 27-59-11, 27-59-12, 27-59-13, 27-59-17, 27-59-23, 27-59-25, 27-59-29, 27-59-31, 27-59-33, 27-59-35, 27-59-41, 27-59-47, 27-59-57 And 27-59-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Delivery Of Natural Gas To Private Refueling Systems And Public Refueling Stations; To Provide For Annual Privilege Tax Permits For Government Vehicles And For Licensing Of Refueling Systems, Refueling Stations And Dealer And Installers Of Compressed Gas Fuel Equipment; To Provide For Monthly Reports By Dealers And Installers Of Compressed Gas Fuel Equipment; To Authorize The Cancellation Of Licenses Of Such Dealers And Installers Under Certain Circumstances; To Provide For Forfeiture By Dealers And Installers Of Licenses Under Certain Circumstances; To Impose Record Keeping Requirements On Dealers And Installers; To Revise Requirements For The Issuance Of Compressed Gas User's Decals; To Require The Owner Of A Fleet Of Motor Vehicles Using Compressed Gas As A Fuel To File Annual Reports On A Fleet Basis As Opposed To An Individual Motor Vehicle Basis; To Provide For The Inspection Of Private Refueling Stations; To Provide The Manner In Which Refunds Of Overpayment Of Taxes Shall Be Made To Certain Users And Distributors; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alternative Fuel Vehicles for Mississippi Act of 2013; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-27 | House | Passed |
2013-02-27 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |