MS HB449 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-9-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Appointment Of All Superintendents Of Schools From And After January 1, 2016; To Amend Section 37-5-61, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Appointment Of The Superintendent Of Schools In County School Districts From And After January 1, 2016; To Amend Sections 37-9-25, 37-7-105, 37-7-725, 37-9-23, 37-17-6, 37-43-39 And 23-15-297, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Provisions Of This Act; To Repeal Section 37-9-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For A Referendum On The Question Of Retaining The Elective Method Of Choosing The County Superintendent Of Education; To Repeal Sections 37-5-63, 37-5-65, 37-5-67, 37-5-69, 37-5-71 And 37-5-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Election Of County Superintendents Of Education And Filling Vacancies In The Office Of County Superintendent Of Education, Effective January 1, 2016; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School district superintendents; require all to be appointed beginning in 2016.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | House | Died On Calendar |
2013-02-12 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2013-02-05 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Education |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2013/pdf/history/HB/HB0449.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2013/html/HB/0400-0499/HB0449IN.htm |