MS HB1798 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From General Fund In The State Treasury For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The State Fire Academy For The Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Fire Academy.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Deweese [R] | Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Sam Creekmore [R] |
Rep. Becky Currie [R] | Rep. Missy Warren McGee [R] | Rep. Omeria Scott [D] | Rep. Jerry Turner [R] |
Rep. Charles Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | House | Died In Conference |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Parker,Butler |
2024-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Deweese,Read,Turner |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To A2 |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: A2 To AP |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations C;Appropriations A |