MS HB1304 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 69-1-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Commissioner Of Agriculture And Commerce To Adopt Rules And Regulations To Provide For The Grading, By An Official Inspector, Of Any Grain Submitted For Sale At Any Elevator Or Grain Dealer By A Grain Producer; To Require The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Commerce To Adopt Rules Governing The Standards For Sampling And Grading Grain That Are Consistent With The Standards For Sampling And Grading Grain Developed By The United States Department Of Agriculture; To Require The Department To Certify Grain Dealers And Courses Of Instruction In Sampling And Grading Grain; To Provide For The Issuance Of Certificate For Individuals Conducting Courses In Sampling And Grading Grain; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Grain graders; provide process for certification of.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pigott [R] | Rep. Lester Carpenter [R] | Rep. Kevin Ford [R] | Rep. Jill Ford [R] |
Rep. Justin Keen [R] | Rep. Timmy Ladner [R] | Rep. Vince Mangold [R] | Rep. Clay Mansell [R] |
Rep. Brad Mattox [R] | Rep. Ken Morgan [R] | Rep. Donnie Scoggin [R] | Rep. Fred Shanks [R] |
Rep. Joseph Tubb [R] | Rep. Price Wallace [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture |
2024-02-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed |
2024-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Agriculture |